Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3636 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17042 Week
» 70058 Month
» 189585 Year
» 3216438 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Aston
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Aston |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 10 | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W10 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 3D | 01/01/1923 | 31/05/1960 | 21D | 01/06/1960 | 31/08/1963 | 2J | 01/09/1963 | 16/10/1965 |
|
Date Closed |
11/10/1965 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the fork of the Aston-Coventry, and Aston-New Street
lines south of the station. The yard is visible from both lines.
Go across Lichfield Road outside Aston Station into Holborn Hill.
Turn right into Long Acre, and the shed entrance is a gate on the right
hand side of this road. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Web Link |
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 3D | 01/06/1960 | Change of code to 21D | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 2J | 11/10/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|