Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 39 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6015 Week
» 12149 Month
» 240033 Year
» 1461598 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hellifield


Depot Details
Depot Name Hellifield
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
20G187531/05/1950
23B01/06/195006/10/1951
20G07/10/195131/01/1957
24H01/02/195717/06/1963
Date Closed 17/06/1963
Big 4 Company LMS
1947 Directions The shed is on the north side of the line at the west end of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

A boarded crossing runs from the station platforms to the shed.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 20G
01/06/1950Change of code to 23B
07/10/1951Change of code to 20G
01/02/1957Change of code to 24H
17/06/1963Depot closed