Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 844 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6628 Week
» 28017 Month
» 147544 Year
» 3174397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Heaton Mersey
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Heaton Mersey |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 21HM | 1875 | 31/12/1910 | STP | 1875 | 30/04/1950 | 21b | 01/01/1911 | 31/12/1922 | M21HM | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 19D | 01/01/1923 | 31/12/1948 | 13C | 01/02/1950 | 21/05/1950 | 9F | 22/05/1950 | 31/12/1956 | 17E | 01/01/1957 | 31/03/1958 | 9F | 01/04/1958 | 06/05/1968 |
|
Date Opened |
01/1889 |
Date Closed |
06/05/1968 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Information |
This shed was a joint LNER (CLC)/LMS shed. |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the C.L.C. line west of Stockport
(Tiviot Dale) Station. The yard is partially visible from the line.
From Stockport Tiviot Dale Station.
Turn left outside the station into Lancashire Hill, and continue
into Bridge Street. Turn right into Great Underbank, continue into
Chestergate, Brinksway, and then Stockport Road for about a mile.
Turn right into Gorsey Bank Road, and a cinder path leads from the
right-hand side across a river to the shed. Walking time 35 minutes.
From Stockport L.M.S. Station.
Go straight ahead outside the station along Station Road, and turn
left into Wellington Road. Descend the flight of steps into Mersey
Square, proceed along Chestergate in a westerly direction, and continue
as stated above. Walking time 30 minutes.
A tram service, labelled Cheadle Heath, operates between Mersey
Square and the end of Gorsey Bank Road.
Note. This is a joint L.N.E. and L.M.S. shed.
See also under Manchester.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to STP | 1875 | Change of code to 21HM | 01/1889 | Depot opened | 01/01/1911 | Change of code to 21b | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M21HM | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 19D | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 13C | 01/05/1950 | Change of code to 9F | 01/01/1957 | Change of code to 17E | 01/04/1958 | Change of code to 9F | 06/05/1968 | Depot closed |
|
|
|