Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17937 Week
» 70953 Month
» 190480 Year
» 3217333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Hatfield
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Hatfield |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | HAT | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 34C | 01/02/1950 | 31/12/1960 |
|
Date Closed |
14/01/1961 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GNR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the west side of the station. The yard is partially
visible from the line.
Turn right from the station yard, and right again after a few yards
into an alley. Continue across the footbridge over the railway and turn
right at the end.
The shed entrance is on the right hand side a few yards further on.
Walking time 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to HAT | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 34C | 14/01/1961 | Depot closed |
|
|
|