Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 226 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 226 Week
» 11519 Month
» 276152 Year
» 1497717 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Yorkshire Engine Company



Order Details for Lot No: YE/YE377
Builder Yorkshire Engine Company
Order Date 10/1927
For 6 Steam locomotives
Class N2
Information N2/3

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
2685 2223 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1928 05/08/1959  
2686 2224 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 12/1928 23/09/1961  
2687 2225 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 01/1929 16/09/1962  
2688 2226 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 01/1929 02/01/1960  
2689 2227 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 02/1929 19/10/1957  
2690 2228 N2 GNR Gresley 0-6-2T 03/1929 02/09/1960