Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry
Builder | Vulcan Foundry |
Order Date | 1935 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | 5MT |
Administration | Crewe Works order #123 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5075 | 4618 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 02/1935 | 09/09/1967 | |
5076 | 4619 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 29/06/1968 | |
5077 | 4620 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 14/08/1965 | |
5078 | 4621 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 30/10/1965 | |
5079 | 4622 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 08/03/1967 | |
5080 | 4623 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 10/1967 | |
5081 | 4624 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 16/10/1965 | |
5082 | 4625 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 09/07/1966 | |
5083 | 4626 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 16/12/1967 | |
5084 | 4627 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 29/11/1966 | |
5085 | 4628 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
5086 | 4629 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
5087 | 4630 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 03/1935 | 26/07/1963 | |
5088 | 4631 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 12/09/1964 | |
5089 | 4632 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 26/08/1967 | |
5090 | 4633 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 06/12/1965 | |
5091 | 4634 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 10/09/1966 | |
5092 | 4635 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 16/12/1967 | |
5093 | 4636 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 10/1965 | |
5094 | 4637 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 25/02/1967 | |
5095 | 4638 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 03/08/1968 | |
5096 | 4639 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 03/08/1968 | |
5097 | 4640 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 18/06/1966 | |
5098 | 4641 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
5099 | 4642 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 04/1935 | 16/09/1963 | |
5100 | 4643 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 28/09/1963 | |
5101 | 4644 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 16/03/1968 | |
5102 | 4645 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 30/01/1965 | |
5103 | 4646 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 09/1964 | |
5104 | 4647 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 29/06/1968 | |
5105 | 4648 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 29/10/1966 | |
5106 | 4649 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 14/01/1967 | |
5107 | 4650 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 16/09/1967 | |
5108 | 4651 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 11/12/1965 | |
5109 | 4652 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 05/1935 | 01/04/1967 | |
5110 | 4653 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 17/08/1968 | |
5111 | 4654 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 28/10/1967 | |
5112 | 4655 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 15/10/1966 | |
5113 | 4656 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 03/07/1965 | |
5114 | 4657 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 13/01/1968 | |
5115 | 4658 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 29/11/1966 | |
5116 | 4659 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 29/07/1967 | |
5117 | 4660 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 22/10/1965 | |
5118 | 4661 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 08/10/1966 | |
5119 | 4662 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 29/12/1962 | |
5120 | 4663 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 06/1967 | |
5121 | 4664 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 05/1964 | |
5122 | 4665 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 06/1935 | 11/04/1964 | |
5123 | 4666 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1935 | 16/09/1963 | |
5124 | 4667 | 5MT | LMS | Stanier | 4-6-0 | 07/1935 | 01/05/1967 |