Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 104 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6080 Week
» 12214 Month
» 240098 Year
» 1461663 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry



Order Details for Lot No: VF/2333
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Date 01/1946
For 50 Steam locomotives
Class B1

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1140 5498 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/04/1947 31/12/1966  
1141 5499 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/04/1947 25/07/1965  
1142 5500 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 15/04/1947 22/09/1963  
1143 5501 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 15/04/1947 24/02/1964  
1144 5502 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 17/04/1947 19/04/1964  
1145 5503 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 17/04/1947 02/01/1966  
1146 5504 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 22/04/1947 12/03/1964  
1147 5505 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 22/04/1947 16/12/1965  
1148 5506 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 25/04/1947 02/09/1966  
1149 5507 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 25/04/1947 23/09/1962  
1150 5508 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 29/04/1947 16/09/1962  
1151 5509 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 29/04/1947 16/09/1962  
1152 5510 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/05/1947 19/04/1964  
1153 5511 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/05/1947 17/01/1965  
1154 5512 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/05/1947 16/09/1962  
1155 5513 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/05/1947 01/03/1964  
1156 5514 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/05/1947 25/11/1963  
1157 5515 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/05/1947 01/08/1965  
1158 5516 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/05/1947 17/04/1966  
1159 5517 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 14/05/1947 22/09/1963  
1160 5518 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/05/1947 22/09/1963  
1161 5519 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/05/1947 06/12/1966  
1162 5520 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 21/05/1947 08/12/1964  
1163 5521 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 23/05/1947 16/09/1962  
1164 5522 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 23/05/1947 10/09/1962  
1165 5523 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 28/05/1947 01/11/1964  
1166 5524 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/05/1947 16/09/1962  
1167 5525 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/05/1947 06/12/1964  
1168 5526 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/06/1947 03/10/1965  
1169 5527 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/06/1947 28/12/1963  
1170 5528 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 06/06/1947 09/07/1962  
1171 5529 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 11/06/1947 16/09/1962  
1172 5530 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/06/1947 16/12/1965  
1173 5531 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/06/1947 23/01/1967  
1174 5532 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 18/06/1947 28/12/1963  
1175 5533 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 18/06/1947 28/12/1963  
1176 5534 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 17/06/1947 07/11/1965  
1177 5535 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 25/06/1947 22/09/1963  
1178 5536 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 23/06/1947 13/02/1964  
1179 5537 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 27/06/1947 10/01/1965  
1180 5538 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 30/06/1947 01/05/1967  
1181 5539 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 02/07/1947 25/11/1963  
1182 5540 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 04/07/1947 16/09/1962  
1183 5541 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/07/1947 09/07/1962  
1184 5542 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/07/1947 29/12/1962  
1185 5543 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 09/07/1947 11/10/1964  
1186 5544 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 16/07/1947 05/11/1962  
1187 5545 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 29/07/1947 03/09/1962  
1188 5546 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 29/07/1947 14/11/1965  
1189 5547 B1 LNER Thompson 4-6-0 08/08/1947 11/05/1967