Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry
Builder | Vulcan Foundry |
Order Date | 1944 |
For | 43 Steam locomotives |
Class | WD/8 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
79220 | 5163 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1944 | 27/02/1966 | ||
79221 | 5164 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1944 | 09/01/1967 | ||
79222 | 5165 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1944 | 10/1956 | ||
79223 | 5166 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1944 | 03/1954 | ||
79224 | 5167 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 11/1944 | 22/11/1964 | ||
79225 | 5168 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 03/04/1965 | ||
79226 | 5169 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 02/01/1966 | ||
79227 | 5170 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
79228 | 5171 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 12/02/1966 | ||
79229 | 5172 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 10/09/1962 | ||
79230 | 5173 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 12/1955 | ||
79231 | 5174 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 04/1955 | ||
79232 | 5175 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 24/05/1962 | ||
79233 | 5176 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 09/12/1963 | ||
5177 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 15/12/1944 | 12/11/1962 | |||
79235 | 5178 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 21/01/1967 | ||
79236 | 5179 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 04/07/1965 | ||
79237 | 5180 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 08/1959 | ||
79238 | 5181 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 05/1956 | ||
79239 | 5182 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 09/09/1967 | ||
79240 | 5183 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 08/06/1964 | ||
79241 | 5184 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 16/09/1962 | ||
79242 | 5185 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1944 | 29/07/1963 | ||
79243 | 5186 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 14/11/1965 | ||
79244 | 5187 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 05/07/1967 | ||
79245 | 5188 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 16/07/1962 | ||
79246 | 5189 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 11/1949 | ||
79247 | 5190 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 23/01/1966 | ||
79248 | 5191 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 09/1953 | ||
79249 | 5192 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 09/1954 | ||
79250 | 5193 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 1957 | ||
79251 | 5194 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 22/11/1965 | ||
79252 | 5195 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 04/1955 | ||
79253 | 5196 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 21/11/1965 | ||
79254 | 5197 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 09/09/1967 | ||
79255 | 5198 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 01/1954 | ||
79256 | 5199 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 01/1954 | ||
79257 | 5200 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 01/1973 | ||
79258 | 5201 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 09/1954 | ||
79259 | 5202 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 14/02/1964 | ||
79260 | 5203 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 10/1956 | ||
79261 | 5204 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1945 | 01/12/1962 | ||
79262 | 5205 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1945 | 01/08/1965 |