Manufacturer: Vulcan Foundry
Builder | Vulcan Foundry |
Order Date | 1942 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | WD/8 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7460 | 4976 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 28/12/1963 | ||
7461 | 4977 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 09/09/1967 | ||
7462 | 4978 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 12/02/1966 | ||
7463 | 4979 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 06/11/1962 | ||
7464 | 4980 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 12/1943 | 29/12/1962 | ||
7465 | 4981 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 17/08/1963 | ||
7466 | 4982 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 12/05/1967 | ||
7467 | 4983 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 17/08/1967 | ||
7468 | 4984 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 01/03/1964 | ||
7469 | 4985 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 30/05/1965 | ||
7470 | 4986 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 29/11/1963 | ||
7471 | 4987 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 30/09/1967 | ||
7472 | 4988 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 01/1954 | ||
7473 | 4989 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 25/04/1964 | ||
7474 | 4990 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 27/06/1967 | ||
7475 | 4991 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 12/1957 | ||
7476 | 4992 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 11/06/1962 | ||
7477 | 4993 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 07/1957 | ||
7478 | 4994 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 05/1963 | ||
7479 | 4995 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 01/1944 | 24/06/1967 | ||
7480 | 4996 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 13/05/1964 | ||
7481 | 4997 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 25/10/1965 | ||
7482 | 4998 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 08/06/1967 | ||
7483 | 4999 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 12/1956 | ||
7484 | 5000 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 16/11/1965 | ||
7485 | 5001 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 04/09/1966 | ||
7486 | 5002 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 02/09/1963 | ||
7487 | 5003 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 11/06/1962 | ||
7488 | 5004 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 09/12/1963 | ||
7489 | 5005 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 16/12/1963 | ||
7490 | 5006 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 08/1957 | ||
7491 | 5007 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 17/04/1966 | ||
7492 | 5008 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 05/1967 | ||
7493 | 5009 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 03/10/1965 | ||
7494 | 5010 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 27/03/1965 | ||
7495 | 5011 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 02/1944 | 09/1954 | ||
7496 | 5012 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 07/11/1965 | ||
7497 | 5013 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 08/1967 | ||
7498 | 5014 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 17/08/1963 | ||
7499 | 5015 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 20/01/1967 | ||
7500 | 5016 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 11/1949 | ||
7501 | 5017 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 19/10/1966 | ||
7502 | 5018 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 04/04/1965 | ||
7503 | 5019 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 26/09/1965 | ||
7504 | 5020 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 27/06/1965 | ||
7505 | 5021 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 20/01/1967 | ||
7506 | 5022 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 24/07/1966 | ||
7507 | 5023 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 18/11/1963 | ||
7508 | 5024 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 12/11/1962 | ||
7509 | 5025 | WD/8 | WD | 2-8-0 | 03/1944 | 08/1957 |