Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1895 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | Dean Goods |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2451 | 1453 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1895 | 10/1940 | |
2452 | 1454 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1895 | 27/10/1952 | |
2453 | 1455 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1895 | 06/08/1921 | |
2454 | 1456 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1895 | 10/1940 | |
2455 | 1457 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1895 | 10/1940 | |
2456 | 1458 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 | |
2457 | 1459 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 | |
2458 | 1460 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1895 | 11/05/1954 | |
2459 | 1461 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 | |
2460 | 1462 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1895 | 14/04/1954 | |
2461 | 1463 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 | |
2462 | 1464 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1895 | 16/01/1953 | |
2463 | 1465 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1895 | 10/1940 | |
2464 | 1466 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1896 | 19/12/1949 | |
2465 | 1467 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1896 | 10/1940 | |
2466 | 1468 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1896 | 10/1940 | |
2467 | 1469 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1896 | 10/1940 | |
2468 | 1470 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1896 | 12/01/1953 | |
2469 | 1471 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1896 | 10/1940 | |
2470 | 1472 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1896 | 12/1940 |