Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 151 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7158 Week
» 13292 Month
» 241176 Year
» 1462741 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/412
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1956
For 15 Diesel locomotives
Class 08

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
13025   08 BR   0-6-0 05/09/1953 17/07/1983  
13026   08 BR   0-6-0 03/10/1953 12/11/1972  
13027   08 BR   0-6-0 03/10/1953 25/09/1983  
13028   08 BR   0-6-0 03/10/1953 01/08/1973  
13029   08 BR   0-6-0 03/10/1953 07/12/1986  
13030   08 BR   0-6-0 03/10/1953 17/03/1985  
13031   08 BR   0-6-0 31/10/1953 25/09/1983  
13032   08 BR   0-6-0 31/10/1953 26/12/1982  
13033   08 BR   0-6-0 31/10/1953 18/12/1977  
13034   08 BR   0-6-0 28/11/1953 19/11/1972  
13035   08 BR   0-6-0 28/11/1953 17/12/1972  
13036   08 BR   0-6-0 28/11/1953 04/07/1982  
13037   08 BR   0-6-0 28/11/1953 17/12/1972  
13038   08 BR   0-6-0 28/11/1953 30/12/1972  
13039   08 BR   0-6-0 28/11/1953 02/11/1980