Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 183 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2328 Week
» 16585 Month
» 244469 Year
» 1466034 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/404
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1954
For 5 Diesel locomotives
Class 08

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
13000   08 BR   0-6-0 01/11/1952 19/11/1972  
13001   08 BR   0-6-0 01/11/1952 19/11/1972  
13002   08 BR   0-6-0 01/11/1952 17/07/1972  
13003   08 BR   0-6-0 14/11/1952 17/07/1972  
13004   08 BR   0-6-0 14/11/1952 30/06/1978