Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1954 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | Standard Class 3 Tank |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
82030 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 21/12/1954 | 31/12/1965 | ||
82031 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 30/12/1954 | 10/12/1966 | ||
82032 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 01/01/1955 | 01/05/1965 | ||
82033 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 13/01/1955 | 19/09/1965 | ||
82034 | Standard Class 3 Tank | BR | Riddles | 2-6-2T | 28/01/1955 | 10/12/1966 |