Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 371 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2959 Week
» 32457 Month
» 369303 Year
» 1590868 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/376
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1949
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class Modified Hall

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
7920   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 05/09/1950 03/06/1965  
7921   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 12/09/1950 16/12/1963  
7922   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 20/09/1950 31/12/1965  
7923   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 26/09/1950 03/06/1965  
7924   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 29/09/1950 31/12/1965  
7925   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 09/10/1950 31/12/1965  
7926   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 12/10/1950 26/12/1964  
7927   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 24/10/1950 03/12/1965  
7928   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 30/10/1950 08/03/1965  
7929   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 02/11/1950 21/08/1965