Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 360 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1609 Week
» 22051 Month
» 358897 Year
» 1580462 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/368
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1947
For 29 Steam locomotives
Class Modified Hall

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
6991   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 23/11/1948 31/12/1965  
6992   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 30/11/1948 08/06/1964  
6993   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 06/12/1948 31/12/1965  
6994   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 10/12/1948 14/11/1964  
6995   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 21/12/1948 26/03/1965  
6996   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 04/01/1949 09/10/1964  
6997   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 19/01/1949 13/11/1964  
6998   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 28/01/1949 31/12/1965  
6999   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 10/02/1949 31/12/1965  
7900   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 07/04/1949 26/12/1964  
7901   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 22/03/1949 26/02/1964  
7902   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 31/03/1949 01/06/1964  
7903   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 08/04/1949 15/06/1964  
7904   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 19/04/1949 31/12/1965  
7905   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 29/04/1949 23/05/1964  
7906   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 20/12/1949 08/03/1965  
7907   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 05/01/1950 31/12/1965  
7908   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 11/01/1950 09/10/1965  
7909   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 20/01/1950 18/11/1965  
7910   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 31/01/1950 06/02/1965  
7911   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 21/02/1950 16/12/1963  
7912   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 03/03/1950 09/10/1965  
7913   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 13/03/1950 08/03/1965  
7914   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 21/03/1950 31/12/1965  
7915   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 30/03/1950 09/10/1965  
7916   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 06/04/1950 26/12/1964  
7917   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 21/04/1950 06/08/1965  
7918   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 26/04/1950 20/02/1965  
7919   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 04/05/1950 31/12/1965