Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 381 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 2969 Week
» 32467 Month
» 369313 Year
» 1590878 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/366
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1947
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class Modified Hall

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
6971   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 02/10/1947 31/10/1964  
6972   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 07/10/1947 10/03/1964  
6973   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 10/10/1947 25/08/1965  
6974   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 15/10/1947 21/05/1965  
6975   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 21/10/1947 02/12/1963  
6976   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 29/10/1947 09/10/1965  
6977   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 05/11/1947 28/12/1963  
6978   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 07/11/1947 02/07/1965  
6979   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 12/11/1947 27/02/1965  
6980   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 20/11/1947 09/10/1965  
6981   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 30/01/1948 10/03/1964  
6982   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 11/02/1948 10/08/1964  
6983   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 13/02/1948 25/08/1965  
6984   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 25/02/1948 03/12/1965  
6985   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 24/02/1948 21/09/1964  
6986   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 03/03/1948 21/04/1965  
6987   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 10/03/1948 21/09/1964  
6988   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 17/03/1948 21/09/1964  
6989   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 25/03/1948 01/06/1964  
6990   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 08/04/1948 03/12/1965