Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 127 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6103 Week
» 12237 Month
» 240121 Year
» 1461686 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/353
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1944
For 40 Steam locomotives
Class 8F

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
8440   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 05/06/1944 18/02/1967  
8441   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 06/06/1944 06/04/1968  
8442   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 13/06/1944 02/03/1968  
8443   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 15/06/1944 11/1966  
8444   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 20/06/1944 14/02/1966  
8445   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 01/07/1944 04/05/1968  
8446   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 01/07/1944 24/07/1965  
8447   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 14/07/1944 29/01/1966  
8448   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 20/07/1944 27/07/1968  
8449   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 01/08/1944 20/05/1967  
8450   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 28/08/1944 30/09/1967  
8451   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 05/09/1944 04/05/1968  
8452   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 09/09/1944 29/01/1966  
8453   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 19/09/1944 13/04/1968  
8454   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 29/09/1944 05/07/1967  
8455   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 14/10/1944 28/11/1964  
8456   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 20/10/1944 02/09/1967  
8457   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 23/10/1944 09/1966  
8458   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 04/11/1944 08/04/1967  
8459   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 18/11/1944 01/04/1967  
8460   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 13/12/1944 16/09/1967  
8461   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 16/12/1944 04/01/1965  
8462   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 22/12/1944 19/11/1966  
8463   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 02/01/1945 29/06/1964  
8464   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 13/01/1945 26/08/1967  
8465   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 15/02/1945 16/03/1968  
8466   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 24/02/1945 08/05/1967  
8467   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 05/03/1945 15/06/1968  
8468   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 16/03/1945 02/03/1968  
8469   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 24/03/1945 16/12/1967  
8470   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 24/04/1945 25/11/1967  
8471   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 28/04/1945 27/04/1968  
8472   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 07/05/1945 21/05/1966  
8473   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 18/05/1945 04/11/1967  
8474   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 30/05/1945 16/09/1967  
8475   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 08/06/1945 29/10/1966  
8476   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 15/06/1945 10/08/1968  
8477   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 23/06/1945 10/09/1966  
8478   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 30/06/1945 26/06/1965  
8479   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 21/07/1945 12/02/1966