Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 105 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6081 Week
» 12215 Month
» 240099 Year
» 1461664 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/351
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1944
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class 8F

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
8430   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 07/03/1944 24/04/1965  
8431   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 11/03/1944 06/05/1964  
8432   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 17/03/1944 08/10/1966  
8433   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 24/03/1944 06/04/1968  
8434   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 31/03/1944 01/01/1966  
8435   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 17/04/1944 06/05/1967  
8436   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 28/04/1944 23/12/1967  
8437   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 03/05/1944 30/03/1968  
8438   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 08/05/1944 18/11/1967  
8439   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 17/05/1944 04/11/1967