Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 353 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1602 Week
» 22044 Month
» 358890 Year
» 1580455 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/350
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1944
For 12 Steam locomotives
Class Modified Hall

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
6959   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 02/03/1944 31/12/1965  
6960   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 06/03/1944 01/06/1964  
6961   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 13/03/1944 10/09/1965  
6962   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 05/04/1944 07/01/1963  
6963   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 26/04/1944 21/07/1965  
6964   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 31/05/1944 18/09/1965  
6965   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 28/07/1944 26/10/1965  
6966   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 31/05/1944 21/09/1964  
6967   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 15/08/1944 31/12/1965  
6968   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 05/09/1944 13/09/1963  
6969   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 16/09/1944 20/02/1965  
6970   Modified Hall GWR Hawksworth 4-6-0 29/09/1944 15/06/1964