Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 173 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7180 Week
» 13314 Month
» 241198 Year
» 1462763 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/349
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1943
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class 8F

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
8410   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 22/09/1943 03/08/1968  
8411   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 28/09/1943 08/07/1967  
8412   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 05/10/1943 31/12/1966  
8413   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 12/10/1943 11/1965  
8414   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 15/10/1943 08/10/1966  
8415   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 22/10/1943 13/08/1966  
8416   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 01/11/1943 26/06/1965  
8417   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 06/11/1943 29/04/1967  
8418   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 10/11/1943 09/1966  
8419   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 17/11/1943 08/05/1965  
8420   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 26/11/1943 13/04/1964  
8421   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 06/12/1943 10/02/1968  
8422   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 10/12/1943 26/03/1966  
8423   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 18/12/1943 03/08/1968  
8424   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 22/12/1943 24/02/1968  
8425   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 31/12/1943 04/11/1967  
8426   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 31/12/1943 11/06/1966  
8427   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 13/01/1944 07/08/1965  
8428   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 17/01/1944 09/1966  
8429   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 27/01/1944 11/09/1965