Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 83 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6059 Week
» 12193 Month
» 240077 Year
» 1461642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/348
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1943
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class 8F

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
8400   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 31/05/1943 03/08/1968  
8401   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 03/07/1943 04/09/1965  
8402   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 02/07/1943 23/12/1967  
8403   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 12/07/1943 31/07/1965  
8404   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 23/07/1943 09/1966  
8405   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 08/08/1943 23/07/1966  
8406   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 14/08/1943 04/09/1965  
8407   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 23/08/1943 12/1963  
8408   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 02/09/1943 11/11/1967  
8409   8F LMS Stanier 2-8-0 08/09/1943 12/04/1965