Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1942 |
For | 23 Steam locomotives |
Class | 28xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3844 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 20/04/1942 | 01/10/1965 | ||
3845 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 25/04/1942 | 27/06/1964 | ||
3846 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 04/05/1942 | 01/11/1963 | ||
3847 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 08/05/1942 | 17/03/1964 | ||
3848 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/05/1942 | 02/07/1965 | ||
3849 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 09/06/1942 | 08/05/1965 | ||
3850 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/06/1942 | 21/08/1965 | ||
3851 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 18/06/1942 | 02/07/1965 | ||
3852 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 20/06/1942 | 25/04/1964 | ||
3853 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 24/06/1942 | 16/12/1963 | ||
3854 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 25/09/1942 | 16/06/1965 | ||
3855 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/10/1942 | 21/08/1965 | ||
3856 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 08/10/1942 | 19/10/1964 | ||
3857 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 08/10/1942 | 07/03/1964 | ||
3858 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 13/10/1942 | 10/09/1963 | ||
3859 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 29/10/1942 | 21/05/1965 | ||
3860 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 31/10/1942 | 10/08/1964 | ||
3861 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/11/1942 | 21/07/1965 | ||
3862 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 04/11/1942 | 06/02/1965 | ||
3863 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 12/11/1942 | 26/10/1965 | ||
3864 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 17/11/1942 | 21/07/1965 | ||
3865 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 26/11/1942 | 27/03/1965 | ||
3866 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/12/1942 | 02/07/1965 |