Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1940 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 28xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3824 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 10/09/1940 | 08/06/1964 | ||
3825 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 16/09/1940 | 19/09/1964 | ||
3826 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 24/09/1940 | 15/01/1965 | ||
3827 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 30/10/1940 | 13/11/1962 | ||
3828 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 06/11/1940 | 03/10/1964 | ||
3829 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 21/11/1940 | 07/03/1964 | ||
3830 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 30/11/1940 | 03/06/1965 | ||
3831 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 13/12/1940 | 17/09/1963 | ||
3832 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 07/01/1941 | 20/04/1964 | ||
3833 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 09/01/1941 | 04/07/1963 |