Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1940 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Hall |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5996 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/06/1940 | 27/08/1962 | ||
5997 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/06/1940 | 24/07/1962 | ||
5998 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 12/06/1940 | 17/03/1964 | ||
5999 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/06/1940 | 21/09/1962 | ||
6900 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/06/1940 | 23/10/1964 | ||
6901 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/07/1940 | 15/06/1964 | ||
6902 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/07/1940 | 01/05/1961 | ||
6903 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 10/07/1940 | 18/09/1965 | ||
6904 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 13/07/1940 | 23/01/1965 | ||
6905 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 20/07/1940 | 08/06/1964 |