Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1939 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Hall |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5986 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 21/11/1939 | 10/09/1963 | ||
5987 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 23/11/1939 | 15/01/1964 | ||
5988 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 28/11/1939 | 09/10/1965 | ||
5989 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 05/12/1939 | 13/07/1962 | ||
5990 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 06/12/1939 | 16/01/1965 | ||
5991 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 14/12/1939 | 18/07/1964 | ||
5992 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/12/1939 | 06/08/1965 | ||
5993 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 22/12/1939 | 13/05/1963 | ||
5994 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 29/12/1939 | 07/03/1963 | ||
5995 | Hall | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 04/01/1940 | 25/04/1963 |