Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 54 Today
» 1125 Yesterday
» 3420 Week
» 54 Month
» 336900 Year
» 1558465 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/320
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1938
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class 81xx

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
99 1992 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 26/09/1938 04/10/1962  
3115 2070 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 30/11/1939 26/06/1965  
3116 2071 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 28/07/1939 18/05/1962  
3118 2073 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 15/06/1938 14/05/1964  
3120 2075 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 17/06/1939 28/12/1963  
3123 2088 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 25/03/1938 22/03/1961  
3124 2089 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 13/01/1939 26/12/1964  
3126 2091 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 01/04/1939 20/06/1957  
3133 2140 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 26/09/1939 29/11/1960  
3145 2152 81xx GWR Collett 2-6-2T 01/11/1938 28/11/1963