Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1937 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | Castle |
Information | Rebuilds of Star class 4-6-0s |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4063 | 2917 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/06/1937 | 07/01/1959 | |
4064 | 2918 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 16/04/1937 | 02/07/1963 | |
4065 | 2919 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 13/07/1939 | 14/02/1964 | |
4066 | 2920 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 11/12/1937 | 10/11/1958 | |
4067 | 2921 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 03/12/1940 | 01/08/1963 | |
4068 | 2922 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/03/1939 | 21/09/1962 | |
4069 | 2923 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/11/1939 | 14/11/1964 | |
4070 | 2924 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 01/05/1939 | 31/05/1962 | |
4071 | 2925 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 18/12/1938 | 03/10/1964 | |
4072 | 2926 | Castle | GWR | Collett | 4-6-0 | 07/04/1938 | 29/07/1963 |