Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1932 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | 14xx |
Information | Order also included 20 58xx 0-4-2T's. |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4800 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 08/1932 | 03/06/1957 | ||
4801 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 08/1932 | 06/10/1958 | ||
4802 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 08/1932 | 22/10/1956 | ||
4803 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/1932 | 05/11/1957 | ||
4804 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/1932 | 27/02/1956 | ||
4805 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/1932 | 22/09/1958 | ||
4806 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/1932 | 24/03/1958 | ||
4807 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/1932 | 30/06/1960 | ||
4808 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/1932 | 28/03/1958 | ||
4809 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 10/1932 | 14/10/1963 | ||
4810 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 17/03/1933 | 05/06/1961 | ||
4811 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 21/03/1933 | 01/10/1956 | ||
4812 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 24/01/1933 | 30/06/1960 | ||
4813 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/04/1933 | 14/03/1956 | ||
4814 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/04/1933 | 08/04/1957 | ||
4815 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 11/04/1933 | 11/02/1957 | ||
4816 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 20/04/1933 | 22/10/1956 | ||
4817 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 21/04/1933 | 16/02/1959 | ||
4818 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 26/04/1933 | 10/1958 | ||
4819 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 26/04/1933 | 27/04/1961 | ||
4820 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 02/11/1933 | 06/11/1964 | ||
4821 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/11/1933 | 28/12/1963 | ||
4822 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/11/1933 | 13/06/1957 | ||
4823 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 08/11/1933 | 19/01/1959 | ||
4824 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 10/11/1933 | 02/12/1963 | ||
4825 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 15/11/1933 | 27/02/1956 | ||
4826 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 17/11/1933 | 03/04/1962 | ||
4827 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 17/11/1933 | 30/06/1960 | ||
4828 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 20/11/1933 | 01/06/1959 | ||
4829 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 24/11/1933 | 16/03/1959 | ||
6700 | 2381 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 02/1930 | 30/06/1961 | |
6701 | 2382 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 02/1930 | 05/06/1959 | |
6702 | 2383 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 18/07/1960 | |
6703 | 2384 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 28/01/1958 | |
6704 | 2385 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 03/1930 | 10/03/1958 | |
6705 | 2386 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 04/1930 | 29/01/1958 | |
6706 | 2387 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 04/1930 | 28/01/1958 | |
6707 | 2388 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 04/1930 | 05/06/1959 | |
6708 | 2389 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 05/1930 | 09/12/1957 | |
6709 | 2390 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 05/1930 | 29/01/1958 | |
6710 | 2391 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 26/08/1957 | |
6711 | 2392 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 09/06/1959 | |
6712 | 2393 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 18/07/1960 | |
6713 | 2394 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 28/09/1957 | |
6714 | 2395 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 06/1930 | 02/12/1963 | |
6715 | 2396 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/1930 | 22/05/1958 | |
6716 | 2397 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/1930 | 09/02/1959 | |
6717 | 2398 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 07/1930 | 09/02/1959 | |
6718 | 2399 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 08/1930 | 21/05/1958 | |
6719 | 2400 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 08/1930 | 18/07/1960 | |
6720 | 2401 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/1930 | 26/07/1961 | |
6721 | 2402 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/1930 | 10/02/1959 | |
6722 | 2403 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 09/1930 | 27/01/1958 | |
6723 | 2404 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 10/1930 | 09/02/1959 | |
6724 | 2405 | 14xx | GWR | Collett | 0-4-2T | 10/1930 | 01/11/1963 |