Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1408 Yesterday
» 3738 Week
» 6320 Month
» 270953 Year
» 1492518 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/255
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1928
For 50 Steam locomotives
Class 56xx

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
6650   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 05/1965  
6651   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 10/1965  
6652   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 12/1963  
6653   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 12/1963  
6654   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 06/1965  
6655   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 03/1965  
6656   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 09/1965  
6657   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 06/1965  
6658   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 04/1965  
6659   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1928 10/1963  
6660   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 06/1964  
6661   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 06/1965  
6662   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 04/1963  
6663   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 06/1963  
6664   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 12/1963  
6665   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 10/1965  
6666   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 07/1963  
6667   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 11/1965  
6668   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 04/12/1965  
6669   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 05/12/1962  
6670   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 10/1963  
6671   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 10/1965  
6672   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 21/07/1965  
6673   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 03/1963  
6674   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 07/1963  
6675   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 06/1963  
6676   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 04/1963  
6677   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 09/02/1963  
6678   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 11/1964  
6679   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1928 09/1965  
6680   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 04/1964  
6681   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 10/1965  
6682   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 02/1964  
6683   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 10/1965  
6684   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 11/1964  
6685   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 09/1964  
6686   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 04/1964  
6687   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 21/05/1962  
6688   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 04/1964  
6689   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 06/1965  
6690   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 06/1964  
6691   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 06/1965  
6692   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 09/1965  
6693   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 09/02/1963  
6694   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 10/1963  
6695   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 07/1964  
6696   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 12/1963  
6697   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 05/1966  
6698   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 09/03/1963  
6699   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1928 12/1963