Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1029 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4889 Week
» 7471 Month
» 272104 Year
» 1493669 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Swindon Works



Order Details for Lot No: SW/244
Builder Swindon Works
Order Date 1927
For 30 Steam locomotives
Class 56xx

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
6600   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1927 24/08/1962  
6601   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1927 05/11/1962  
6602   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 08/1927 10/1964  
6603   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1927 03/1964  
6604   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1927 10/1965  
6605   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1927 01/1964  
6606   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1927 01/1965  
6607   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1927 15/03/1963  
6608   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1927 06/1964  
6609   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1927 13/09/1963  
6610   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1927 01/02/1963  
6611   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 09/1927 11/1965  
6612   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1927 05/1965  
6613   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1927 10/1965  
6614   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 10/1927 06/1965  
6615   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 12/1927 13/05/1963  
6616   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 12/1927 27/09/1962  
6617   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 12/1927 01/09/1962  
6618   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 12/1927 13/11/1963  
6619   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 01/1928 14/03/1963  
6620   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 01/1928 12/1963  
6621   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 01/1928 12/1964  
6622   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 01/1928 12/1964  
6623   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 01/1928 24/06/1963  
6624   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 01/1928 06/1964  
6625   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 01/1928 11/1965  
6626   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 01/1928 11/1965  
6627   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 02/1928 01/11/1963  
6628   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 02/1928 05/1965  
6629   56xx GWR Collett 0-6-2T 02/1928 15/10/1962