Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1926 |
For | 50 Steam locomotives |
Class | 56xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5650 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1926 | 24/06/1963 | ||
5651 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1926 | 26/12/1964 | ||
5652 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1926 | 27/09/1962 | ||
5653 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1926 | 01/01/1963 | ||
5654 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1926 | 16/12/1963 | ||
5655 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1926 | 03/06/1965 | ||
5656 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1926 | 14/02/1964 | ||
5657 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1926 | 27/07/1962 | ||
5658 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1926 | 13/11/1965 | ||
5659 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1926 | 27/11/1965 | ||
5660 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1926 | 23/10/1964 | ||
5661 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1926 | 27/07/1962 | ||
5662 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1926 | 13/11/1964 | ||
5663 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1926 | 03/08/1962 | ||
5664 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 02/1926 | 31/08/1962 | ||
5665 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1926 | 16/06/1965 | ||
5666 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1926 | 16/07/1963 | ||
5667 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1926 | 17/07/1965 | ||
5668 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1926 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5669 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 06/1926 | 07/09/1964 | ||
5670 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1926 | 19/10/1964 | ||
5671 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1926 | 06/01/1964 | ||
5672 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1926 | 13/09/1963 | ||
5673 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1926 | 08/03/1965 | ||
5674 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 08/1926 | 20/04/1964 | ||
5675 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1926 | 26/12/1964 | ||
5676 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1926 | 06/11/1965 | ||
5677 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1926 | 06/11/1965 | ||
5678 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1926 | 15/01/1964 | ||
5679 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1926 | 29/07/1963 | ||
5680 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 09/1926 | 02/12/1963 | ||
5681 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 10/1926 | 07/05/1965 | ||
5682 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 10/1926 | 07/05/1962 | ||
5683 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 10/1926 | 10/03/1964 | ||
5684 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 10/1926 | 17/07/1965 | ||
5685 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 14/02/1964 | ||
5686 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 08/03/1965 | ||
5687 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 02/12/1963 | ||
5688 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 03/06/1965 | ||
5689 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 21/05/1965 | ||
5690 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 01/08/1963 | ||
5691 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 25/06/1965 | ||
5692 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 21/07/1965 | ||
5693 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 14/01/1963 | ||
5694 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 13/11/1964 | ||
5695 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 18/12/1962 | ||
5696 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 07/05/1965 | ||
5697 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 25/04/1963 | ||
5698 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 21/09/1962 | ||
5699 | 56xx | GWR | Collett | 0-6-2T | 01/1927 | 13/11/1964 |