Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1918 |
For | 28 Steam locomotives |
Class | 28xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2856 | 2762 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 04/1918 | 20/04/1964 | |
2857 | 2763 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 05/1918 | 25/04/1963 | |
2858 | 2764 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 05/1918 | 09/01/1963 | |
2859 | 2765 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 05/1918 | 26/12/1964 | |
2860 | 2766 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 05/1918 | 27/04/1962 | |
2861 | 2767 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 06/1918 | 01/03/1963 | |
2862 | 2768 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 06/1918 | 20/04/1964 | |
2863 | 2769 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 06/1918 | 15/06/1959 | |
2864 | 2770 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 07/1918 | 15/06/1959 | |
2865 | 2771 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 07/1918 | 09/01/1963 | |
2866 | 2772 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 09/1918 | 28/03/1963 | |
2867 | 2773 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 10/1918 | 29/07/1963 | |
2868 | 2774 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 10/1918 | 15/06/1959 | |
2869 | 2775 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 10/1918 | 15/06/1959 | |
2870 | 2776 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 10/1918 | 15/06/1959 | |
2871 | 2777 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/1918 | 24/05/1963 | |
2872 | 2778 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/1918 | 26/08/1963 | |
2873 | 2779 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/1918 | 26/12/1964 | |
2874 | 2780 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/1918 | 24/05/1963 | |
2875 | 2781 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 12/1918 | 01/04/1964 | |
2876 | 2782 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/1919 | 15/01/1965 | |
2877 | 2783 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 01/1919 | 11/01/1960 | |
2878 | 2784 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 02/1919 | 15/06/1959 | |
2879 | 2785 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 03/1919 | 10/08/1964 | |
2880 | 2786 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 03/1919 | 15/06/1959 | |
2881 | 2787 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 03/1919 | 11/01/1960 | |
2882 | 2788 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 04/1919 | 16/12/1963 | |
2883 | 2789 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 04/1919 | 19/11/1962 |