Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1912 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | 28xx |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2836 | 2436 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 15/06/1964 | |
2837 | 2437 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 30/05/1960 | |
2838 | 2438 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 09/1912 | 06/08/1959 | |
2839 | 2439 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 15/06/1964 | |
2840 | 2440 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 15/06/1959 | |
2841 | 2441 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 16/12/1963 | |
2842 | 2442 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 10/1912 | 17/09/1963 | |
2843 | 2443 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 15/06/1959 | |
2844 | 2444 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 04/03/1960 | |
2845 | 2445 | 28xx | GWR | Churchward | 2-8-0 | 11/1912 | 24/05/1963 |