Manufacturer: Swindon Works
Builder | Swindon Works |
Order Date | 1897 |
For | 30 Steam locomotives |
Class | Dean Goods |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2551 | 1632 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 22/09/1953 | |
2552 | 1633 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2553 | 1634 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2554 | 1635 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 14/11/1945 | |
2555 | 1636 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2556 | 1637 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 29/06/1953 | |
2557 | 1638 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2558 | 1639 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2559 | 1640 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2560 | 1641 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1897 | 10/1940 | |
2561 | 1642 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 10/1940 | |
2562 | 1643 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 10/1940 | |
2563 | 1644 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 21/04/1921 | |
2564 | 1645 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1898 | 01/09/1945 | |
2565 | 1646 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 10/1940 | |
2566 | 1647 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 10/1940 | |
2567 | 1648 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 10/1940 | |
2568 | 1649 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 02/1898 | 18/05/1953 | |
2569 | 1650 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 04/1898 | 04/10/1948 | |
2570 | 1651 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 04/1898 | 17/01/1949 | |
2571 | 1652 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 10/1898 | 10/1940 | |
2572 | 1653 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1898 | 22/12/1952 | |
2573 | 1654 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1898 | 03/02/1953 | |
2574 | 1655 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 11/1898 | 10/1940 | |
2575 | 1656 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 28/02/1947 | |
2576 | 1657 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 12/1898 | 10/1940 | |
2577 | 1658 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1899 | 10/1940 | |
2578 | 1659 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1899 | 07/09/1953 | |
2579 | 1660 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1899 | 04/01/1954 | |
2580 | 1661 | Dean Goods | GWR | Dean | 0-6-0 | 01/1899 | 10/1940 |