Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 08/1910 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J17 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1230 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 10/1910 | 16/11/1959 | ||
1231 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 11/1910 | 25/04/1962 | ||
1232 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 11/1910 | 16/09/1962 | ||
1233 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 11/1910 | 11/02/1962 | ||
1234 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 11/1910 | 02/02/1960 | ||
1235 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 11/1910 | 01/11/1954 | ||
1236 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 12/1910 | 17/04/1962 | ||
1237 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 12/1910 | 01/12/1958 | ||
1238 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1911 | 29/05/1961 | ||
1239 | J17 | GER | Holden | 0-6-0 | 01/1911 | 02/01/1961 |