Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 1903 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | F4 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
140 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 06/1903 | 03/1932 | ||
141 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 06/1903 | 29/12/1955 | ||
142 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 06/1903 | 20/12/1956 | ||
143 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 06/1903 | 23/11/1955 | ||
144 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 06/1903 | 21/11/1955 | ||
145 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 07/1903 | 21/04/1958 | ||
146 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 07/1903 | 01/1930 | ||
147 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 07/1903 | 04/11/1957 | ||
148 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 08/1903 | 08/1931 | ||
149 | F4 | GER | Holden | 2-4-2T | 08/1903 | 05/1931 |