Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 619 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4479 Week
» 7061 Month
» 271694 Year
» 1493259 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/K89
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1923
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
990   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1923 03/08/1959  
991   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1923 09/11/1959  
992   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1923 04/12/1960  
993   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1924 12/09/1960  
994   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1924 01/01/1959  
995   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1924 04/07/1960  
996   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1924 10/09/1961  
997   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 02/1924 16/02/1959  
998   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 02/1924 24/11/1960  
999   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 03/1924 11/09/1962