Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 608 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4468 Week
» 7050 Month
» 271683 Year
» 1493248 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Stratford Works



Order Details for Lot No: ST/K85
Builder Stratford Works
Order Date 1921
For 10 Steam locomotives
Class N7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
1002   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1921 27/07/1959  
1003   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 07/1921 27/07/1959  
1004   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1921 10/08/1959  
1005   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1921 06/10/1958  
1006   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 09/1921 11/08/1958  
1007   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1921 22/07/1958  
1008   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1921 11/08/1958  
1009   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1921 28/04/1958  
1010   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1921 01/01/1959  
1011   N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1921 24/11/1960