Manufacturer: Stratford Works
Builder | Stratford Works |
Order Date | 1920 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | J19 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1250 | J19 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 09/1920 | 24/11/1959 | ||
1251 | J19 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 10/1920 | 11/02/1962 | ||
1252 | J19 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 10/1920 | 01/01/1959 | ||
1253 | J19 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 10/1920 | 06/08/1962 | ||
1254 | J19 | GER | Hill | 0-6-0 | 11/1920 | 16/01/1961 |