Manufacturer: Sharp Stewart
Builder | Sharp Stewart |
Order Date | 1892 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | J36 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
678 | 3768 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 13/10/1960 | |
679 | 3769 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 08/02/1957 | |
680 | 3770 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 28/11/1963 | |
681 | 3771 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 06/05/1960 | |
682 | 3772 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 30/05/1963 | |
683 | 3773 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 24/04/1951 | |
684 | 3774 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 07/09/1951 | |
685 | 3775 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 14/04/1948 | |
686 | 3776 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 08/10/1962 | |
687 | 3777 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 05/03/1962 | |
688 | 3778 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 02/1892 | 02/07/1959 | |
689 | 3779 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 03/1892 | 08/10/1962 | |
690 | 3780 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 03/1892 | 27/06/1963 | |
691 | 3781 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 03/1892 | 06/1945 | |
692 | 3782 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 03/1892 | 10/1946 |