Manufacturer: Sharp Stewart
Builder | Sharp Stewart |
Order Date | 01/1902 |
For | 20 Steam locomotives |
Class | D9 |
Information | Order E1182 was expanded to cover 25 Class 11B locomotives (later LNER class D9) for the GCR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1018 | 4828 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 02/1902 | 24/07/1950 | |
1019 | 4829 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 02/1902 | 01/1949 | |
1020 | 4830 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 02/1902 | 02/1943 | |
1021 | 4831 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 02/1902 | 12/06/1950 | |
1022 | 4832 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 02/1902 | 08/1942 | |
1023 | 4833 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 02/1902 | 15/08/1949 | |
1024 | 4834 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 02/1902 | 21/11/1949 | |
1025 | 4835 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 11/1945 | |
1026 | 4836 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 18/07/1949 | |
1027 | 4837 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 04/1950 | |
1028 | 4838 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 05/1939 | |
1029 | 4839 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 12/10/1949 | |
1030 | 4840 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 09/05/1949 | |
1031 | 4841 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 18/07/1949 | |
1032 | 4842 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 03/1945 | |
1033 | 4843 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 18/07/1949 | |
1034 | 4844 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 03/1902 | 21/11/1949 | |
1035 | 4845 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 04/1902 | 18/07/1949 | |
1036 | 4846 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 04/1902 | 01/1946 | |
1037 | 4847 | D9 | GCR | Robinson | 4-4-0 | 05/1902 | 12/10/1949 |