Manufacturer: St. Rollox Works
Builder | St. Rollox Works |
Order Date | 1908 |
For | 6 Steam locomotives |
Class | 652 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
652 | 652 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 03/1908 | 18/09/1948 | ||
653 | 652 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 03/1908 | 14/11/1963 | ||
654 | 652 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 03/1908 | 01/10/1962 | ||
656 | 652 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 03/1908 | 11/12/1961 | ||
657 | 652 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 03/1908 | 23/08/1963 | ||
665 | 652 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 06/1908 | 20/11/1961 |