Manufacturer: St. Rollox Works
Builder | St. Rollox Works |
Order Date | 1897 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | 711 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
329 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 09/1897 | 08/1947 | ||
330 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 09/1897 | 13/09/1961 | ||
331 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 10/1897 | 27/09/1957 | ||
332 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 10/1897 | 20/06/1961 | ||
333 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 10/1897 | 02/10/1961 | ||
593 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 10/1897 | 27/02/1956 | ||
594 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 10/1897 | 04/11/1952 | ||
595 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 11/12/1956 | ||
596 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 07/01/1957 | ||
597 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 02/10/1961 | ||
598 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 16/06/1959 | ||
599 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 11/1897 | 11/12/1961 |