Manufacturer: St. Rollox Works
Builder | St. Rollox Works |
Order Date | 1896 |
For | 12 Steam locomotives |
Class | 711 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
576 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 11/1896 | 06/08/1962 | ||
577 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 12/1896 | 02/10/1961 | ||
578 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 12/1896 | 08/10/1962 | ||
579 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 12/1896 | 16/02/1960 | ||
580 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 12/1896 | 11/1949 | ||
581 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 12/1896 | 02/1953 | ||
582 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 12/1896 | 02/10/1961 | ||
583 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 02/1897 | 20/11/1948 | ||
584 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 02/1897 | 02/10/1961 | ||
585 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 02/1897 | 11/09/1948 | ||
586 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 02/1897 | 13/09/1961 | ||
587 | 711 | CR | McIntosh | 0-6-0 | 02/1897 | 27/06/1961 |