Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Builder | Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Date | 1898 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | J52 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1216 | 2921 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 12/1898 | 15/05/1958 | |
1217 | 2922 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 01/1899 | 03/1956 | |
1218 | 2923 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1899 | 04/04/1958 | |
1219 | 2924 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1899 | 16/11/1955 | |
1220 | 2925 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 02/1899 | 18/06/1956 | |
1221 | 2926 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 03/1899 | 16/12/1955 | |
1222 | 2927 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 03/1899 | 14/03/1956 | |
1223 | 2928 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 04/1899 | 11/10/1956 | |
1224 | 2929 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 04/1899 | 24/06/1957 | |
1225 | 2930 | J52 | GNR | Stirling | 0-6-0ST | 04/1899 | 27/05/1959 |