Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 670 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4530 Week
» 7112 Month
» 271745 Year
» 1493310 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd



Order Details for Lot No: RS/RS383
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Date 05/1925
For 20 Steam locomotives
Class N7

Number (as built) Works Number Class Built For Designer Wheels Date to Service Date Withdrawn Info
907 3897 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 04/12/1960  
912 3898 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 03/05/1962  
913 3899 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 04/12/1960  
916 3900 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 10/08/1959  
918 3901 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 10/04/1961  
919 3902 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 08/06/1959  
935 3903 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 10/1925 07/04/1961  
940 3904 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1925 19/01/1959  
941 3905 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1925 18/05/1959  
947 3906 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1925 19/10/1959  
950 3907 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 11/1925 04/05/1959  
952 3908 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1925 01/11/1960  
964 3909 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1925 30/11/1960  
966 3910 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1925 29/02/1960  
967 3911 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1925 09/03/1959  
968 3912 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1925 03/02/1959  
970 3913 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1925 10/09/1961  
971 3914 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 12/1925 06/04/1959  
987 3915 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1926 10/09/1961  
988 3916 N7 GER Hill 0-6-2T 01/1926 16/09/1962