Manufacturer: Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Builder | Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Date | 1923 |
For | 10 Steam locomotives |
Class | N15 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
519 | 3851 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 01/1923 | 01/10/1962 | |
520 | 3852 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 01/1923 | 18/12/1959 | |
521 | 3853 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 02/1923 | 06/06/1960 | |
522 | 3854 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 02/1923 | 18/05/1961 | |
523 | 3855 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 03/1923 | 13/06/1958 | |
524 | 3856 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 03/1923 | 10/01/1958 | |
525 | 3857 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 03/1923 | 17/05/1960 | |
526 | 3858 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 03/1923 | 26/06/1958 | |
527 | 3859 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 03/1923 | 16/07/1962 | |
528 | 3860 | N15 | NBR | Reid | 0-6-2T | 03/1923 | 18/02/1960 |