Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.
Builder | Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Date | 1901 |
For | 40 Steam locomotives |
Class | J11 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
973 | 6035 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 30/06/1959 | |
974 | 6036 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 29/11/1958 | |
975 | 6037 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 11/04/1955 | |
976 | 6038 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 24/04/1959 | |
977 | 6039 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 25/07/1962 | |
978 | 6040 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 04/08/1958 | |
979 | 6041 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 10/10/1955 | |
980 | 6042 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 08/05/1959 | |
981 | 6043 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 05/11/1960 | |
982 | 6044 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 09/1901 | 27/06/1955 | |
983 | 6045 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 10/1901 | 26/05/1958 | |
984 | 6046 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 10/1901 | 07/11/1955 | |
985 | 6047 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 20/07/1962 | |
986 | 6048 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 23/12/1957 | |
987 | 6049 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 05/09/1959 | |
988 | 6050 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 30/09/1957 | |
989 | 6051 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 07/07/1958 | |
990 | 6052 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 20/06/1959 | |
991 | 6053 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 26/12/1959 | |
992 | 6054 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 10/11/1955 | |
993 | 6055 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 16/09/1957 | |
994 | 6056 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 12/1901 | 02/05/1955 | |
995 | 6057 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 01/1902 | 30/09/1958 | |
996 | 6058 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 01/1902 | 25/02/1957 | |
997 | 6059 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1902 | 11/04/1959 | |
6060 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 03/1902 | 20/07/1962 | ||
999 | 6061 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 23/08/1958 | |
1000 | 6062 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 04/07/1955 | |
1001 | 6063 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 08/09/1961 | |
1002 | 6064 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 27/08/1956 | |
1003 | 6065 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 04/03/1961 | |
1004 | 6066 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 14/01/1961 | |
1005 | 6067 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 02/02/1957 | |
1006 | 6068 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 18/05/1961 | |
1007 | 6069 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 23/09/1962 | |
1008 | 6070 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 04/1902 | 19/04/1960 | |
1009 | 6071 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 05/1902 | 29/08/1961 | |
1010 | 6072 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 05/1902 | 15/03/1961 | |
1011 | 6073 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 05/1902 | 15/08/1962 | |
1012 | 6074 | J11 | GCR | Robinson | 0-6-0 | 05/1902 | 17/08/1959 |