Manufacturer: Neilson, Reid & Co.
Builder | Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Date | 1891 |
For | 15 Steam locomotives |
Class | J36 |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
663 | 4382 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 10/1891 | 10/11/1962 | |
664 | 4383 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 10/1891 | 10/07/1951 | |
665 | 4384 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 10/1891 | 04/1931 | |
666 | 4385 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 10/1891 | 11/1935 | |
667 | 4386 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 10/1891 | 04/01/1961 | |
668 | 4387 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 06/05/1952 | |
669 | 4388 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 08/10/1962 | |
670 | 4389 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 26/08/1957 | |
671 | 4390 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 11/1891 | 07/1937 | |
672 | 4391 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 01/1931 | |
673 | 4392 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 14/07/1966 | |
674 | 4393 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 04/1943 | |
675 | 4394 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 12/08/1957 | |
676 | 4395 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 10/1926 | |
677 | 4396 | J36 | NBR | Holmes | 0-6-0 | 12/1891 | 25/05/1951 |