Manufacturer: Nine Elms Works
Builder | Nine Elms Works |
Order Date | 1905 |
For | 5 Steam locomotives |
Class | M7 |
Built For | LSWR |
Number (as built) | Works Number | Class | Built For | Designer | Wheels | Date to Service | Date Withdrawn | Info |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
46 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 05/1905 | 07/02/1959 | ||
47 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 05/1905 | 06/02/1960 | ||
48 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 05/1905 | 05/01/1964 | ||
49 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 05/1905 | 02/06/1962 | ||
50 | M7 | LSWR | Drummond | 0-4-4T | 06/1905 | 27/01/1962 |